MO SB702 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to unemployment compensation benefits
Title
Modifies the law relating to unemployment compensation benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: SB 702 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: SB 702 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-09 | House | S Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2016-05-09 | House | S concurs in HA 1 |
2016-05-04 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 2 H offered & withdrawn (Hinson)--(4037S01.02H) |
2016-05-05 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Lant)--(4037S01.01H) |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations (Pursuant to H Rule 27.10) |
2016-04-27 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations (Pursuant to H Rule 27.10) |
2016-04-18 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations (Pursuant to H Rule 27.10) |
2016-04-18 | House | Reported Do Pass H Workforce Standards and Development |
2016-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass H Workforce Standards and Development |
2016-04-18 | House | Hearing Conducted H Workforce Standards and Development |
2016-04-14 | House | Referred H Workforce Standards and Development |
2016-04-12 | House | H Second Read |
2016-04-11 | House | H First Read |
2016-04-11 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 702-Munzlinger |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |