MO SB706 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the expiration of the lead-acid battery fee from December 31, 2018, to December 31, 2023
Title
Extends the expiration of the lead-acid battery fee from December 31, 2018, to December 31, 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading |
2018-05-11 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-08 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-05-02 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-04-25 | House | Hearing Conducted H Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred H Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-04-10 | House | H Second Read |
2018-04-09 | House | H First Read |
2018-04-05 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 706-Riddle |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |