MO SB707 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to vehicle sales
Title
Modifies provisions relating to vehicle sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - House: SB 707 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 120 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: SB 707 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 119 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House: SB 707 (HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 104 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House: SB 707 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: SB 707 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 119 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House: SB 707 (HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 104 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House: SB 707 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (5008S.03C) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 707-Schatz |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |