MO SB709 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 709-Schatz, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 709-Schatz, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the process by which travel hardships are granted to public school pupils
Title
Modifies the process by which travel hardships are granted to public school pupils
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Schatz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 709-Schatz, with SCS |
2018-04-30 | Senate | SCS Reported from S Education Committee |
2018-04-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (4962S.02C) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 709-Schatz |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |