MO SB71 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading (HCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading (HCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to workers' compensation premiums
Title
Modifies provisions relating to workers' compensation premiums
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading (HCS) |
2019-05-16 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Bill Placed on Formal Calendar |
2019-05-14 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Judiciary |
2019-04-30 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Judiciary |
2019-04-16 | House | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred H Judiciary |
2019-04-08 | House | H Second Read |
2019-04-04 | House | H First Read |
2019-04-04 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Perfected |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 71-Brown |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |