MO SB718 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to health care
Title
Modifies provisions relating to health care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 718 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 718 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 134 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 718 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: SB 718 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 121 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: SB 718 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 112 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: SB 718 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 111 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: SB 718 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 125 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: SB 718 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 133 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: SB 718 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 111 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: SB 718 (*HA 9) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 49 N: 78 NV: 1 Abs: 33) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - House - House: SB 718 (*HA 1 HA 12) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 53) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: SB 718 (HA 16) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 88 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 50) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: SB 718 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 90 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 44) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 718 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 134 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 718 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: SB 718 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 121 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: SB 718 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 112 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: SB 718 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 111 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: SB 718 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 125 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: SB 718 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 133 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House: SB 718 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 111 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: SB 718 (*HA 9) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 49 N: 78 NV: 1 Abs: 33) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - House - House: SB 718 (*HA 1 HA 12) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 53) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: SB 718 (HA 16) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 88 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 50) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: SB 718 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 90 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 44) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2018-05-18 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2018-05-18 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2018-05-17 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2018-05-17 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Eigel) |
2018-05-17 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-17 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-16 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-16 | House | H distributes CCR (4209S11.01F) |
2018-05-14 | House | Senate conferees appointed: Eigel, Onder, Sater, Holsman, Nasheed |
2018-05-10 | House | House conferees appointed: Rhoads, Barnes (60), Rehder, Stevens (46) and Walker (74) |
2018-05-10 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2018-05-10 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2018-05-08 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2018-05-08 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2018-05-08 | House | Motion to reconsider Third Reading Vote H adopted |
2018-05-08 | House | Motion to reconsider adoption of EC H adopted |
2018-05-08 | House | Motion to return bill to house per their request S adopted (Eigel) |
2018-05-08 | House | Motion to return bill to house per their request (Eigel) - Motion withdrawn |
2018-05-07 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2018-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-03 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Pursuant to House Rule 53 |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 16 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schroer)--(4209H05.33H) |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 15 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 1 to HA 15 to HCS, as amended, H offered (Evans)--(4209H05.37H) |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 15 to HCS H offered (Neely)--(4209H05.30H) |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 14 to HCS H offered & adopted (Swan)--(4209H05.42H) |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 13 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dogan)--(4209H05.22H) |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 12 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 1 to HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kidd)--(4209H05.44H) |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 12 to HCS H offered (Davis)--(4209H05.25H) |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hill)--(4209H05.14H) |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rehder)--(4209H05.04H) |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 9 to HCS H defeated |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 1 to HA 9 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Frederick)--(4209H05.46H) |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 9 to HCS H offered (Unsicker)--(4209H05.19H) |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lauer)--(4209H05.63H) |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Ruth)--(4209H05.17H) |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Neely)--(4209H05.16H) |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Frederick)--(4209H05.40H) |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pike)--(4209H05.09H) |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 3 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 1 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Franklin)--(4209H05.39H) |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered (Cornejo)--(4209H05.15H) |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Basye)--(4209H05.12H) |
2018-05-03 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pfautsch)--(4209H05.05H) |
2018-04-26 | House | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-03-29 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-03-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2018-03-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2018-03-14 | House | Hearing Conducted H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2018-02-20 | House | H Second Read |
2018-02-19 | House | H First Read |
2018-02-15 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-02-13 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from S Health and Pensions Committee w/SCS |
2018-01-31 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee (4209S.03C) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Committee Vote Reconsidered |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 718-Eigel |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |