MO SB723 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the sunset date for discounted electric rates for qualifying customers of electrical corporations
Title
Repeals the sunset date for discounted electric rates for qualifying customers of electrical corporations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 723-Brown |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26838032 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB723.pdf |