MO SB733 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of the Bright Flight Scholarship Program and Access Missouri Financial Assistance Program
Title
Modifies provisions of the Bright Flight Scholarship Program and Access Missouri Financial Assistance Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by Senate President | |
2010-05-25 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2010-05-12 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2010-05-12 | CCS H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2010-05-12 | CCR H adopted | |
2010-05-11 | H submits CCR | |
2010-05-11 | CCS S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2010-05-11 | CCR S offered & adopted | |
2010-05-06 | H conferees appointed: Kingery, Thomson, Hobbs, Schoemehl, Schupp | |
2010-05-05 | S conferees appointed: Pearce, Rupp, Schaefer, Days, Shoemyer | |
2010-05-05 | H refuses to recede and grants conference | |
2010-05-05 | S requests H recede or grant conference | |
2010-05-05 | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended | |
2010-05-04 | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2010-05-04 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2010-05-04 | HA 2 to HCS H offered & defeated (Colona)--(3902L06.02H) | |
2010-05-03 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hobbs)--(3902L06.03H) | |
2010-04-20 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee | |
2010-04-20 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules-Pursuant Committee | |
2010-04-20 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2010-04-20 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Higher Education Committee | |
2010-04-20 | HCS Voted Do Pass Higher Education Committee | |
2010-04-13 | Hearing Conducted H Higher Education Committee | |
2010-04-08 | Referred H Higher Education Committee | |
2010-04-06 | H Second Read | |
2010-04-01 | H First Read | |
2010-04-01 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Perfected | |
2010-03-30 | SCS, as amended, S adopted | |
2010-03-30 | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Cunningham)--(3902S02.02S) | |
2010-03-25 | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2010-03-24 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (3902S.02C) | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee | |
2010-01-06 | S First Read--SB 733-Pearce |