MO SB769 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies and creates provisions relating to state and local standards
Title
Modifies and creates provisions relating to state and local standards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by Senate President | |
2012-05-30 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2012-05-18 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2012-05-18 | CCS H Third Read and Passed | |
2012-05-18 | CCR H adopted (5671S09.01F) | |
2012-05-18 | CCS S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-05-18 | CCR S offered & adopted (5671S09.1SR) | |
2012-05-17 | H submits CCR | |
2012-05-17 | H conferees appointed: Richardson, Zerr, Cierpiot, Taylor, Sifton | |
2012-05-17 | S conferees appointed: Kraus, Rupp, Kehoe, Green, McKenna | |
2012-05-17 | H refuses to recede and grants conference | |
2012-05-17 | S requests H recede or grant conference | |
2012-05-17 | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended | |
2012-05-16 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2012-05-16 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2012-05-16 | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones-117)--(5671H07.15H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Brattin)--(5671H07.19H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Franz)--(5671H07.13H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hough)--(5671H07.20H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cierpiot)--(5671H07.03F) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 1 to HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2012-05-16 | HA 1 to HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schieber)--(5671H07.14H) | |
2012-05-16 | HA 1 to HCS H offered (Torpey)--(5671H07.10H) | |
2012-05-14 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-10 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-10 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Purusant Committee | |
2012-05-02 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-05-02 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Transportation Funding & Public Institutions Committee | |
2012-05-01 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation Funding & Public Institutions Committee | |
2012-05-01 | Hearing Conducted H Transportation Funding & Public Institutions Committee | |
2012-04-17 | Referred H Transportation Funding & Public Institutions Committee | |
2012-03-23 | H Second Read | |
2012-03-22 | H First Read | |
2012-03-22 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-03-21 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-03-21 | Perfected | |
2012-03-21 | SS S offered & adopted (Kraus)--(5671S.03F) | |
2012-03-08 | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor | |
2012-03-06 | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2012-02-14 | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2012-02-09 | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2012-02-08 | S First Read--SB 769-Kraus |