MO SB769 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to financial transactions by public entities
Title
Modifies provisions relating to financial transactions by public entities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: SB 769 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 129 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: SB 769 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 129 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2018-05-15 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-15 | House | S concurs in HCS |
2018-05-09 | House | Motion to concur in HCS S offered & withdrawn (Cunningham) |
2018-05-09 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-09 | House | HCS H adopted |
2018-05-07 | House | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-03 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-04-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Financial Institutions |
2018-04-24 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Financial Institutions |
2018-04-10 | House | Hearing Conducted H Financial Institutions |
2018-04-04 | House | Referred H Financial Institutions |
2018-03-05 | House | H Second Read |
2018-03-01 | House | H First Read |
2018-03-01 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-02-27 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2018-02-27 | Senate | SA 4 to SCS S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(5199S06.03S) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | SA 3 to SCS S offered & adopted (Holsman)--(5199S06.04S) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Cunningham)--(5199S06.02S) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Schatz)--(5199S06.01S) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from S Insurance and Banking Committee w/SCS |
2018-02-06 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee (5199S.06C) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 769-Cunningham |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Prefiled |