MO SB771 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to solid waste management districts
Title
Modifies provisions relating to solid waste management districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 771-Wallingford |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26899456 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB771.pdf |