MO SB772 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - Hearing Cancelled S Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - Hearing Cancelled S Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Excludes funds designated by taxpayers in an urban district as early childhood education funds from the local tax revenue calculation used to provide funding to charter schools that declared themselves as a local education agency
Title
Excludes funds designated by taxpayers in an urban district as early childhood education funds from the local tax revenue calculation used to provide funding to charter schools that declared themselves as a local education agency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Education Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 772-Hoskins |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=69493044 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB772.pdf |