MO SB786 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to the prosecution of election offenses
Title
Modifies the law relating to the prosecution of election offenses
Sponsors
Sen. Will Kraus [R] | Rep. Tony Dugger [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 786 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 97 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 786 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 103 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 786 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 108 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 786 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 129 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: SB 786 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: SB 786 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 111 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 786 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 103 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 786 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 108 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 786 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 129 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: SB 786 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: SB 786 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 111 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-12 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2016-05-12 | Senate | CCR H adopted |
2016-05-11 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted--(4093S.10S) |
2016-05-11 | House | CCR S offered & adopted--(4093S10.1SR) |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-10 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-05-10 | House | H distributes CCR |
2016-05-09 | House | S conferees appointed: Kraus, Wasson, Hegeman, Walsh, Schupp |
2016-05-09 | House | H conferees appointed: Dugger, Entlicher, McGaugh, Conway(10), Newman |
2016-05-09 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2016-05-06 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2016-05-04 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2016-05-04 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Chipman)--(4093H08.02H) |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 4 to HCS H adopted |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 1 to HA 4 to HCS H offered & defeated (Curtis)--(4093H08.18H) |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered (Dogan)--(4093H08.11H) |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (English)--(4093H08.06H) |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Conway)--(4093H08.04H) |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(4093H08.05H) |
2016-04-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2016-04-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2016-04-19 | House | Reported Do Pass H Elections |
2016-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass H Elections |
2016-04-19 | House | Hearing Conducted H Elections |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred H Elections |
2016-04-04 | House | H Second Read |
2016-03-31 | House | H First Read |
2016-03-31 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-03-30 | Senate | SS, as amended, S adopted |
2016-03-30 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Kraus)--(4093S05.04S) |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-03-30 | Senate | SS S offered (Kraus)--(4093S.05F) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 786-Kraus |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled |