MO SB810 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school districts to make information relating to their annual operating budget publicly available
Title
Requires school districts to make information relating to their annual operating budget publicly available
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 810-Koenig |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Error.aspx |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB810.pdf |