MO SB813 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the offense of peace disturbance and allows a civil action against a person who commits the offense of peace disturbance and obstructs a highway or access to emergency medical services
Title
Modifies the offense of peace disturbance and allows a civil action against a person who commits the offense of peace disturbance and obstructs a highway or access to emergency medical services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (4257S.03C) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 813-Riddle |
2017-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Error.aspx |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB813.pdf |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/comm/SB813.pdf |