MO SB816 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the civil penalty for violating certain underground facility safety standards
Title
Modifies the civil penalty for violating certain underground facility safety standards
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Schatz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 816-Schatz |
2017-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=70001618 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB816.pdf |