MO SB819 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of law relating to the protection of children
Title
Modifies provisions of law relating to the protection of children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 819 (HA 1, HA 1, A.A., HA 2 & HA 4) BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 819 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House: SB 819 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 118 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 819 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House: SB 819 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 118 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 819-Cunningham |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled |