MO SB82 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 82-Cunningham, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 82-Cunningham, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of law relating to health care facilities and certificates of need
Title
Modifies provisions of law relating to health care facilities and certificates of need
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 82-Cunningham, with SCS |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported from S Health and Pensions Committee w/SCS |
2019-03-27 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee (0719S.02C) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 82-Cunningham |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |