MO SB84 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the sunset date on certain geologic resources fees from December 31, 2020, to December 31, 2025
Title
Extends the sunset date on certain geologic resources fees from December 31, 2020, to December 31, 2025
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - House: SB 84 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 134 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2019-05-29 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2019-05-16 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2019-05-16 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2019-05-16 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Bill Placed on Formal Calendar |
2019-05-08 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported Do Pass H Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-04-24 | House | Voted Do Pass H Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-04-15 | House | Hearing Conducted H Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred H Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-03-27 | House | H Second Read |
2019-03-26 | House | H First Read |
2019-03-26 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee-Consent |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 84-Cunningham |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |