MO SB848 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 848-Riddle
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 848-Riddle
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the membership of the Board for Certification of Interpreters
Title
Modifies the membership of the Board for Certification of Interpreters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 848-Riddle |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 848-Riddle |
2018-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=70711079 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB848.pdf |