MO SB852 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates certain memorial infrastructure
Title
Designates certain memorial infrastructure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 852 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 852 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: SB 852 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 136 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 852 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: SB 852 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 136 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-12 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-12 | Senate | CCR H adopted |
2016-05-12 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed--(5382S.02S) |
2016-05-12 | House | CCR S offered & adopted --(5382S02.1SR) |
2016-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-05-11 | House | H distributes CCR |
2016-05-09 | House | S conferees appointed: Brown, Libla, Wieland, Curls, Chappelle-Nadal |
2016-05-09 | House | H conferees appointed: Chipman, Fitzwater(49), Davis, Walton Gray, Adams |
2016-05-09 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2016-05-05 | House | S refuses to concur in HA 1, HA 2, as amended & HA 3 and requests H recede or grant conference |
2016-05-04 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 3 H offered & adopted (English)--(5382S01.11H) |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 2, as amended, H adopted |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 1 to HA 2 H offered & adopted (Davis)--(5382S01.14H) |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 2 H offered (Reiboldt)--(5382S01.07H) |
2016-05-04 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Fitzwater)--(5382S01.12H) |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2016-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass H Transportation |
2016-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass H Transportation |
2016-04-19 | House | Hearing Conducted H Transportation |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred H Transportation |
2016-04-04 | House | H Second Read |
2016-03-31 | House | H First Read |
2016-03-31 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 852-Brown |