MO SB865 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 865-Kehoe
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 865-Kehoe
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the commercial zone of Kansas City to include the city of Holden and certain roadways
Title
Expands the commercial zone of Kansas City to include the city of Holden and certain roadways
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Kehoe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 865-Kehoe |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported from S Economic Development Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 865-Kehoe |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=71152665 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB865.pdf |