MO SB866 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-28 - Referred H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform
Pending: House Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-28 - Referred H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform
Pending: House Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Permits physician assistants to serve as staff on ambulances
Title
Permits physician assistants to serve as staff on ambulances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-28 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-03-15 | House | H Second Read |
2020-03-12 | House | H First Read |
2020-03-12 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee - Consent |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Professional Registration Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | S First Read--SB 866-Brown |