MO SB867 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to transportation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to transportation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15HouseH Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
2020-05-14HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2020-05-14HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2020-05-13HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2020-05-11HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2020-05-11HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2020-05-06HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2020-05-06HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Transportation
2020-05-06HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation
2020-05-06HouseHearing Conducted H Transportation
2020-05-01HouseReferred H Transportation
2020-05-01HouseH Second Read
2020-04-30HouseH First Read
2020-04-29SenateS Third Read and Passed - Consent
2020-04-29SenateSCS S adopted
2020-03-12SenateReported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee w/SCS - Consent
2020-03-12SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent vote adopted (4789S.04C)
2020-03-12SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (4789S.04C)
2020-02-27SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2020-02-20SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2020-01-13SenateS First Read--SB 867-Brown

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback