MO SB871 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to orders of protection for a child, circuit clerks being named a party in expungement proceedings, court reporter fees, service of process after the expiration of the statute of limitations, and judicial positions
Title
Modifies provisions relating to orders of protection for a child, circuit clerks being named a party in expungement proceedings, court reporter fees, service of process after the expiration of the statute of limitations, and judicial positions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: SB 871 (HA 2) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: SB 871 (HA 3) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 94 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: SB 871 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: SB 871 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 122 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: SB 871 (HA 2) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: SB 871 (HA 3) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 94 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: SB 871 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - House - House: SB 871 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 122 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2018-05-15 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-15 | House | S concurs in HCS, as amended |
2018-05-14 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-14 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2018-05-14 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Cornejo)--(5748H02.02H) |
2018-05-14 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Redmon)--(5748H02.08H) |
2018-05-14 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Trent)--(5748H02.06H) |
2018-05-11 | House | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-03 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-04-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws |
2018-04-24 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws |
2018-04-10 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws |
2018-03-29 | House | Referred H General Laws |
2018-03-08 | House | H Second Read |
2018-03-07 | House | H First Read |
2018-03-07 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Consent |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 871-Romine |