MO SB874 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows citizens to summon a grand jury by filing a petition with the court
Title
Allows citizens to summon a grand jury by filing a petition with the court
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Emery [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 874-Emery |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=71153471 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB874.pdf |