MO SB88 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a two year statute of limitation for claims of malpractice or negligence against veterinarians
Title
Establishes a two year statute of limitation for claims of malpractice or negligence against veterinarians
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Brown [R] | Rep. Joe McGaugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 88 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 88 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 125 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 88 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 125 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-12 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-12 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported Do Pass H Judiciary |
2017-04-27 | House | Voted Do Pass H Judiciary |
2017-04-25 | House | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred H Judiciary |
2017-04-19 | House | H Second Read |
2017-04-18 | House | H First Read |
2017-04-13 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Perfected |
2017-04-11 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Government Reform Committee w/SCS |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Government Reform Committee w/SCS - Consent |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Government Reform Committee - Consent vote adopted (0367S.02C) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (0367S.02C) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 88-Brown |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |