MO SB882 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee
Pending: Senate Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee
Pending: Senate Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to transportation devices
Title
Enacts provisions relating to transportation devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2020-01-14 | Senate | S First Read--SB 882-Wieland |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=29450489 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB882.pdf |