MO SB885 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (5806S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (5806S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the cities of Centralia and Lebanon to impose a sales tax for public safety
Title
Authorizes the cities of Centralia and Lebanon to impose a sales tax for public safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (5806S.02C) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 885-Rowden |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=71207715 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB885.pdf |