MO SB887 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the First-Time Home Buyer Savings Account Act and a corresponding income tax deduction
Title
Establishes the First-Time Home Buyer Savings Account Act and a corresponding income tax deduction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Ways and Means Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 887-Rowden |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=71207717 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB887.pdf |