MO SB899 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions relating to password protection
Title
Creates new provisions relating to password protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (5837S.03C) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2018-01-10 | Senate | S First Read--SB 899-Rowden |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Error.aspx |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB899.pdf |