MO SB9 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to agriculture
Title
Modifies provisions relating to agriculture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-11 | Senate | Legislature voted to override Governor's veto |
2013-09-11 | Senate | H adopted motion to override Governor's veto (Guernsey) |
2013-09-11 | Senate | S adopted motion to override Governor's veto (Pearce) |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | CCS#2 H Third Read and Passed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | CCR#2 H adopted |
2013-05-16 | House | CCS#2 S Third Read and Passed (0234S.11S) |
2013-05-16 | House | CCR#2 S offered & adopted (0234S11.1SR) |
2013-05-15 | House | H submits CCR#2 |
2013-05-09 | House | H conferees appointed: Guernsey, Richardson, Mitten |
2013-05-09 | House | S conferees appointed: Pearce, Munzlinger, Sater, Curls, Chappelle-Nadal |
2013-05-09 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2013-05-08 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2013-05-08 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended |
2013-05-07 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2013-05-07 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2013-05-07 | House | HA 7 to HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2013-05-07 | House | HA 1 to HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Guernsey)--(0234H07.36H) |
2013-05-07 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered (Lichtenegger)--(0234H07.30H) |
2013-05-07 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Reiboldt)--(0234H07.22H) |
2013-05-07 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & defeated (Guernsey)--(0234H07.35H) |
2013-05-07 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Guernsey)--(0234H07.20H) |
2013-05-07 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fitzwater)--(0234H07.23H) |
2013-05-07 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Johnson)--(0234H07.01H) |
2013-05-07 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schatz)--(0234H07.18H) |
2013-04-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Agri-Business Committee |
2013-04-16 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Agri-Business Committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Hearing Conducted H Agri-Business Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Referred H Agri-Business Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | H Second Read |
2013-02-19 | House | H First Read |
2013-02-18 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-02-13 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2013-02-13 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Schmitt)--(0234S02.02S) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Taken up for Perfection |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2013-02-06 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee - (0234S.02C) |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 9-Pearce |
2012-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |