MO SB9 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading (HCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading (HCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Senate to try all impeachments
Title
Requires the Senate to try all impeachments
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Emery [R] | Rep. David Gregory [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading (HCS) |
2019-05-16 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-15 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2019-05-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Judiciary |
2019-05-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Judiciary |
2019-05-07 | House | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred H Judiciary |
2019-04-01 | House | H Second Read |
2019-03-28 | House | H First Read |
2019-03-28 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Perfected |
2019-03-13 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Emery)--(0151S.07F) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S withdrawn |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 2 to SCS S offered (Schupp)--(0151S06.05S) |
2019-03-11 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S offered (Holsman)--(0151S06.03S) |
2019-03-11 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & withdrawn (Holsman)--(0151S06.01S) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee w/SCS |
2019-02-11 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (0151S.06C) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 9-Emery |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |