MO SB900 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (5263S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (5263S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to activities extended to persons found guilty of certain criminal offenses
Title
Modifies provisions relating to activities extended to persons found guilty of certain criminal offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (5263S.03C) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-10 | Senate | S First Read--SB 900-Rowden and Curls |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=71290796 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB900.pdf |