MO SB913 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the expiration of the peer review process for architects, landscape architects, land surveyors, and engineers
Title
Removes the expiration of the peer review process for architects, landscape architects, land surveyors, and engineers
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Emery [R] | Rep. Jeff Coleman [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House: SB 913 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | House | Signed by Governor |
2020-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2020-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2020-05-27 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2020-05-15 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2020-05-15 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2020-05-08 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-05-08 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-05-07 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-05-06 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-05-05 | House | Re-referred H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-05-01 | House | Referred H Professional Registration and Licensing |
2020-05-01 | House | H Second Read |
2020-04-30 | House | H First Read |
2020-04-29 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Reported from S Government Reform Committee - Consent |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Government Reform Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | S First Read--SB 913-Emery |