MO SB928 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to health insurer reimbursement practices
Title
Modifies provisions relating to health insurer reimbursement practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported from S Health and Pensions Committee w/SCS |
2018-02-21 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee (5934S.06C) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | S First Read--SB 928-Onder |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Error.aspx |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB928.pdf |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/comm/SB928.pdf |