MO SB931 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Missouri to become a member state of the Recognition of EMS Personnel Licensure Interstate Compact
Title
Authorizes Missouri to become a member state of the Recognition of EMS Personnel Licensure Interstate Compact
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | S First Read--SB 931-Riddle |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=71999152 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB931.pdf |