MO SB951 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to health care
Title
Modifies provisions relating to health care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 951 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 951 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: SB 951 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 121 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 951 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: SB 951 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 121 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from S Health and Pensions Committee |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2018-01-23 | Senate | S First Read--SB 951-Crawford |