MO SB958 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Attorney General to establish an electronic tracking system to monitor sexual assault collection kits
Title
Directs the Attorney General to establish an electronic tracking system to monitor sexual assault collection kits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | S First Read--SB 958-Riddle |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Error.aspx |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB958.pdf |