MO SB97 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Conveys certain property owned by the state
Title
Conveys certain property owned by the state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-11 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by Senate President | |
2011-05-26 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2011-05-12 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-12 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-12 | S concurs in HCS#2, as amended | |
2011-05-09 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-09 | HCS#2, as amended, H adopted | |
2011-05-09 | HA 1 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Riddle)--(0810L06.01H) | |
2011-05-03 | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-05-03 | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-21 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-21 | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass H Local Government Committee | |
2011-04-21 | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Local Government Committee | |
2011-04-20 | HCS Returned to Committee of origin | |
2011-04-13 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-13 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Local Government Committee - Consent | |
2011-04-13 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Local Government Committee - Consent | |
2011-04-13 | Hearing Conducted H Local Government Committee | |
2011-04-04 | Referred H Local Government Committee | |
2011-04-01 | H Second Read | |
2011-03-31 | H First Read | |
2011-03-31 | S Third Read and Passed - Consent | |
2011-02-17 | Reported from S Governmental Accountability Committee to Floor - Consent | |
2011-02-16 | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee - Consent | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing Cancelled S Governmental Accountability Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee | |
2011-01-12 | S First Read--SB 97-Engler |