MO SB986 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes school boards to provide certain information about influenza and influenza vaccines to parents and guardians of students
Title
Authorizes school boards to provide certain information about influenza and influenza vaccines to parents and guardians of students
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee (6321S.02C) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | S First Read--SB 986-Riddle |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Error.aspx |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB986.pdf |