MO SB988 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies several provisions relating to health care providers
Title
Modifies several provisions relating to health care providers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 988 (HA 4, A.A., & HA 5) BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 988 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 128 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 988 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 129 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House: SB 988 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House: SB 988 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 113 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 988 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 128 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 988 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 129 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House: SB 988 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House: SB 988 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 113 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-13 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2016-05-13 | Senate | CCR H adopted |
2016-05-12 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted--(6153S.02S) |
2016-05-12 | House | CCR S offered & adopted--(6153S02.1SR) |
2016-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-05-11 | House | H distributes CCR |
2016-05-09 | House | S conferees appointed: Kraus, Brown, Onder, Sifton, Chappelle-Nadal |
2016-05-09 | House | H conferees appointed: Frederick, Neely, White, Kirkton, Arthur |
2016-05-09 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2016-05-05 | House | S refuses to concur in HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, as amended & HA 5 and requests H recede or grant conference |
2016-05-03 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended - EC adopted |
2016-05-03 | House | HA 5 H offered & adopted (Haahr)--(6153S01.17H) |
2016-05-03 | House | HA 4, as amended, H adopted |
2016-05-03 | House | HA 1 to HA 4 H offered & adopted (Rowden)--(6153S01.15H) |
2016-05-03 | House | HA 4 H offered (Jones)--(6153S01.09H) |
2016-05-03 | House | HA 3 H offered & adopted (Chipman)--(6153S01.01H) |
2016-05-03 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Shumake)--(6153S01.02H) |
2016-05-03 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Frederick)--(6153S01.07H) |
2016-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2016-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2016-04-19 | House | Hearing Conducted H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2016-04-14 | House | Referred H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2016-04-12 | House | H Second Read |
2016-04-11 | House | H First Read |
2016-04-11 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-01-27 | Senate | S First Read--SB 988-Kraus |