MO SCR28 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - H First Read
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - H First Read
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Calls on the Chinese Government to end the practice of organ harvesting from prisoners
Title
Calls on the Chinese Government to end the practice of organ harvesting from prisoners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | H First Read |
2018-05-18 | Senate | S adopted |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S Offered--SCR 28-Schupp and Nasheed |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=70777887 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SCR28.pdf |