MO SCR31 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supports rules and procedures for Article V Conventions
Title
Supports rules and procedures for Article V Conventions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S Offered--SCR 31-Wallingford |