MO SCR35 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-11 - Referred H Special Committee on Tourism
Pending: House Special Committee on Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-11 - Referred H Special Committee on Tourism
Pending: House Special Committee on Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates November 2018 as Diabetes and Cardiovascular Awareness Month
Title
Designates November 2018 as Diabetes and Cardiovascular Awareness Month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Tourism |
2018-05-10 | House | H Second Read |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Reported to the House |
2018-05-09 | Senate | S adopted |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | S Offered--SCR 35-Hegeman |