MO SCR37 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Endorses the Bangert Island Riverfront Transformational Project by the General Assembly
Title
Endorses the Bangert Island Riverfront Transformational Project by the General Assembly
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - House: SCR 37 SCRS FOR THIRD READING - INF (Y: 135 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | H adopted |
2018-05-17 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-15 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-15 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-10 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-10 | House | Reported Do Pass H Economic Development |
2018-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Economic Development |
2018-05-09 | House | Hearing Conducted H Economic Development |
2018-05-07 | House | Referred H Economic Development |
2018-05-03 | House | H Second Read |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Reported to the House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | S adopted, as amended |
2018-05-02 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Eigel)--(6084S01.01S) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Motion for adoption S withdrawn (Eigel) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | S Offered--SCR 37-Eigel and Onder |