MO SCR38 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Disapproves the Missouri Hazardous Waste Management Commission's recommendations regarding the fees and taxes of the Hazardous Waste Management Commission
Title
Disapproves the Missouri Hazardous Waste Management Commission's recommendations regarding the fees and taxes of the Hazardous Waste Management Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: SCR 38 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2020-03-05 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2020-03-04 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2020-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-03-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-02-27 | House | Hearing Conducted H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-02-26 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-02-25 | House | H Second Read |
2020-02-24 | House | H First Read |
2020-02-24 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-01-21 | Senate | S First Read--SCR 38-O'Laughlin |