MO SCR40 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Applies to Congress for the calling of an Article V convention of states to propose an amendment to the United States Constitution regarding term limits for members of Congress
Title
Applies to Congress for the calling of an Article V convention of states to propose an amendment to the United States Constitution regarding term limits for members of Congress
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House: SCR 40 (HA 1) SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 109 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House: SCR 40 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House: SCR 40 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House: SCR 40 (HA 1) SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 109 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House: SCR 40 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House: SCR 40 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2018-05-17 | House | S Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2018-05-17 | House | S concurs in HA 1 |
2018-05-15 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2018-05-15 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (McDaniel)--(6254S01.02H) |
2018-05-08 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-05-02 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2018-05-01 | House | Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2018-05-01 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2018-04-10 | House | H Second Read |
2018-04-09 | House | H First Read |
2018-04-09 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | S First Read--SCR 40-Hoskins |