MO SCR42 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - H Informal Calendar Senate Concurrent Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - H Informal Calendar Senate Concurrent Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Calls upon the Missouri United States Senators to support Senate Bill 120, relating to the declassification of missing Armed Forces personnel records, and aid in the resolution of the cases of unaccounted Missouri service members
Title
Calls upon the Missouri United States Senators to support Senate Bill 120, relating to the declassification of missing Armed Forces personnel records, and aid in the resolution of the cases of unaccounted Missouri service members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | H Informal Calendar Senate Concurrent Resolutions |
2018-05-17 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-15 | House | Reported Do Pass H - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-15 | House | Voted Do Pass H - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-01 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-01 | House | Reported Do Pass H Veterans |
2018-05-01 | House | Voted Do Pass H Veterans |
2018-05-01 | House | Hearing Conducted H Veterans |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred H Veterans |
2018-04-10 | House | H Second Read |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported to the House |
2018-04-09 | Senate | S adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | S First Read--SCR 42-Hoskins |