MO SCR49 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Moves referendum election date for SS#2/SB 19
Title
Moves referendum election date for SS#2/SB 19
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Schatz [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - House - House: SCR 49 SCRs FOR THIRD READING - INF (Y: 96 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-18 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2018-05-17 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2018-05-17 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-17 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-15 | House | Reported Do Pass H - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-15 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-15 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-15 | House | Reported Do Pass H Economic Development |
2018-05-15 | House | Voted Do Pass H Economic Development |
2018-05-15 | House | Hearing Conducted H Economic Development |
2018-05-14 | House | Referred H Economic Development |
2018-05-14 | House | H Second Read |
2018-05-11 | House | H First Read |
2018-05-10 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-10 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & defeated (Nasheed)--(6738S01.01S) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | S First Read--SCR 49-Schatz |